AFRALO
Current RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM(S) | ALS | COMMENTS |
Chairperson | Fatimata Seye Sylla | Senegal | 1) 16 November 2009 - AGM 2011; 2) AGM 2011 - AGM 2013 | Bokk Jang Bokk Jef | Elected |
Vice-Chairperson | Tijani Ben Jemaa | Tunisia | 1) 16 November 2009 - AGM 2011; 2) AGM 2011 - AGM 2013 | FMAI | Elected |
Secretariat | Aziz Hilali | Morocco | 1) AGM 2010 - AGM 2012; 2) AGM 2012 - AGM 2014 | MISOC | Elected |
Former RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM(S) | ALS | COMMENT |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
APRALO
Current RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | ALS | TERM |
CHAIR | Charles Mok | ISOC - HK | 19 May 2011 through 30 June 2011 (finishing term of Hong Xue) and official term of 01 July 2011 through 30 June 2013 |
VICE-CHAIR | Fouad Bajwa | Pakistan ICT Policy Monitor | Re-elected Vice Chair from 30 June to serve 2012-2014 term. |
VICE-CHAIR | Holly Raiche | ISOC - AU | 19 May 2011 through 30 June 2011 (finishing Charles Mok's term) and official term of 01 July 2011 through 30 June 2013 |
SECRETARIAT | ISOC-HK | ISOC-HK: Edmon Chung and Pavan Budhrani (.ASIA) | 2009 through 30 June 2011 (finishing its first term) and new term of 01 July 2011 through 30 June 2013 |
Former RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM(S) | ALS | COMMENT |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHAIR | Hong | ||||
CHAIR | Karaitiana Taiuru | New Zealand | |||
CHAIR | |||||
VICE-CHAIR | |||||
VICE-CHAIR | |||||
VICE-CHAIR | |||||
SECRETARIAT | ISOC-HK (Pavan Budhrani) | Hong Kong | ISOC-HK |
EURALO
Current RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM | ALS | COMMENTS |
CHAIR | Wolf Ludwig | Switzerland | June 2011 - June 2013 | Comunica-ch | Elected |
SECRETARIAT | Oksana Prykhodko | Ukraine | June 2011 - June 2013 | European Media Platform | Elected |
Former RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM(S) | ALS | COMMENT |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
LACRALO
Current RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM | ALS | COMMENTS |
CHAIR | José Francisco Arce | Argentina | 4 May 2012 - 4 May 2013 | AGEIA DENSI | Elected |
SECRETARIAT | Sylvia Herlein Leite | Brazil | 4 May 2012 - 4 May 2013 | INTERNAUTA BRASIL | Elected |
Former RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM(S) | ALS | COMMENT |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHAIR | Andres Piazza | Argentina | 16 April 2009 - 11 July 2011 | AGEIA DENSI Argentina | |
SECRETARIAT | Dev Anand Teelucksingh | Trinidad and Tobago | 16 April 2009 - 4 March 2012 | TTCS - Trinidad and Tobago Computer Society | |
SECRETARIAT | Carlton Samuels | Jamaica | 4 December 2006 to 4 March 2009 | The University of West Indies |
NARALO
Current RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | ALS | TERM |
CHAIR | Garth Bruen | Knujon | 18 August 2012 - AGM 2013 |
SECRETARIAT | Darlene Thompson | N-CAP | AGM 2010 - AGM 2011; AGM 2011-AGM 2012; AGM 2012-AGM 2013 |
Former RALO Officers
POSITION | NAME | LOCATION | TERM(S) | ALS | COMMENT |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHAIR (Interim) | Darlene Thompson | ||||
CHAIR | Beau Brendler | ||||
CHAIR | Evan Leibovitch |