Officers
Position | Name | ALS/Location | Term(s) | Comments |
Chair | France/United Kingdom | 2015AGM - 2017AGM | Selected | |
Secretariat | Comunica-ch; Switzerland | 2015AGM- 2017AGM | Selected |
BOARD MEMBERS (Period 2 years 09 Dec 2015- 09 Dec 2017)
MEMBER | Country |
---|---|
*Olawale Bakare | United Kingdom |
Yrjö Länsipuro | Finland |
Austria | |
Annette Mühlberg | Germany |
Matthieu Camus | France |
*Olawale Bakare was appointed by consensus on Jan 17, 2017. He occupied the position vacated by Jordi Iparraguirre who stepped down In December 2016.
*Erich was appointed by consensus on 9/13/2016. He occupied the position vacant by Mikhail Medrish - Russia who stepped down on 8/14/2016)
ALAC Members
RALO | Member | RALO/NomCom Result | Term |
---|---|---|---|
EURALO | NomCom Selected | 2016AGM-2018AGM | |
EURALO | *Bastiaan Goslings | RALO Elected | 2016AGM-2018AGM |
EURALO | Sebastien Bachollet | RALO Elected and re-elected | 2015AGM-2017AGM 2017 AGM- 2019 AGM |
In accordance with Article XI of the ICANN bylaws, Section 2, Paragraph 4c, "the regular terms of members of the ALAC shall be as follows:
1. The term of one member selected by each RALO shall begin at the conclusion of an ICANN annual meeting in an even-numbered year.
2. The term of the other member selected by each RALO shall begin at the conclusion of an ICANN annual meeting in an odd-numbered year.
3. The terms of three of the members selected by the Nominating Committee shall begin at the conclusion of an annual meeting in an odd-numbered year and the terms of the other two members selected by the Nominating Committee shall begin at the conclusion of an annual meeting in an even-numbered year.
4. The regular term of each member shall end at the conclusion of the second ICANN annual meeting after the term began.
For more information, or if you have questions about joining At-Large, send an email to staff@atlarge.icann.org.
*Veronica Cretu stepped down on 5th January 2016 was replaced by Bastiaan Gossling who was elected by election to complete Veronica's term.
ALAC NomCom Representative
Name | Term(s) |
---|---|
| 2016AGM-2017AGM |
Former EURALO ALAC Representatives, Board Members and Officers