Officers
Previous Regional Officers
Position | Name | ALS/Location | Term |
Chair | Darlene Thompson (Interim Chair) | N-CAP, Canada | 16 July 2012 until 17 August 2012 |
Chair | Beau Brendler | Unaffiliated Member; Canada | AGM 2010 - AGM 2011/AGM 2011-AGM 2012 (Resigned on 15 July 2012) |
Chair | Evan Leibovitch | Canadian Association for Open Source (CLUE); Canada | 29 June 2007 - AGM 2010 |
Secretariat | Darlene Thompson | N-CAP, Canada | AGM 2010 - AGM 2011; AGM 2011-AGM 2012; |
ALAC Representatives
Name | ALS/Location | Term | Comments |
Evan Leibovitch | Canadian Association for Open Source (CLUE); Canada | AGM 2010 - AGM 2012 | Elected |
Ganesh Kumar | Puerto Rico | September 2011-AGM 2012 | Interim appointment by the NomCom |
Marc Rotenberg | United States | AGM 2010 - AGM 2012 | Appointed by NomCom; Resigned 2011 |
Robert Guerra | Privatera; Canada | ||
Beau Brendler | Unaffiliated Member; United States |
At-Large Delegate to the NomCom
Name | ALS/Location | Term |
Glenn McKnight | Foundation for Building Sustainable Communities (FBSC), Canada | 2012 and 2013 |
Eduardo Diaz | ISOC Puerto Rico; Puerto Rico | 2011 and 2010 |
Ross Rader | Unaffiliated Member; Canada | 2009 and 2008 |
Michael Froomkin | 2007 and 2006 | |
Alan Davidson | 2005 and 2004 | |
Brett Fausett | 2003 |