APRALO has four (4) elected Officers to run its affairs and two (2) elected representatives to the ICANN At-Large Advisory Committee (ALAC).
OFFICERS
POSITION | NAME | ALS | TERM |
CHAIR | Charles Mok | ISOC - HK | 19 May 2011 through 30 June 2011 (finishing term of Hong Xue) and official term of 01 July 2011 through 30 June 2013 |
VICE-CHAIR | Fouad Bajwa | Pakistan ICT Policy Monitor | 2010 through 30 June 2012 (Fouad will complete the remainder of Les Allison's term). Re-elected Vice Chair from 30 June 2012-2014. |
VICE-CHAIR | Holly Raiche | ISOC - AU | 19 May 2011 through 30 June 2011 (finishing Charles Mok's term) and official term of 01 July 2011 through 30 June 2013 |
SECRETARIAT | ISOC-HK | ISOC-HK: Edmon Chung and Pavan Budhrani (.ASIA) | 2009 through 30 June 2011 (finishing its first term) and new term of 01 July 2011 through 30 June 2013 |
ALAC REPRESENTATIVES
To help with At-Large organising, and to work with user groups worldwide in advising ICANN on pending issues of interest to end users, ICANN created the 15-member Interim At-Large Advisory Committee (ALAC) in 2003. Current ALAC members from Asia Pacific are
NAME | LOCATION | TERM | COMMENTS |
Australia | AGM 2009- AGM 2011 | Elected | |
James Seng | China | AGM 2009- AGM 2011 | Appointed by NomCom |
Edmon Chung | Hong Kong | AGM 2010 - AGM 2012 | Elected |
ALAC NomCom Representative
NAME | LOCATION | TERM |
Vivek Vivekanandan | India | 2010 - 2011 |
For more information, or if you have questions about joining At-Large, send an email to <staff@atlarge.icann.org>.