AT-LARGE GATEWAY
At-Large Regional Policy Engagement Program (ARPEP)
At-Large Review Implementation Plan Development
Page History
Officers
2019-2021
...
Position | Name | ALS/Location | Term(s) | Comments | ||
France/United Kingdom | 2015AGM 2019 AGM - 2017AGM2021AGM | Selected | ||||
Secretariat | Comunica-ch; Switzerland | Russia | 2019AGM- 2021 AGM2015AGM- 2017AGM | Selected |
BOARD MEMBERS (Period 2 years
...
2017-2019)
MEMBER | Country |
---|
Roberto Gaetano | Italy |
Yrjö Länsipuro | Finland |
Austria | |
Annette Mühlberg | Germany |
Jean-Jacques Subrenat | France |
*Olawale Bakare was appointed by consensus on Jan 17, 2017. He occupied the position vacated by Jordi Iparraguirre who stepped down In December 2016.
*Erich was appointed by consensus on 9/13/2016. He occupied the position vacant by Mikhail Medrish - Russia who stepped down on 8/14/2016)
ALAC Members
RALO | Member | RALO/NomCom Result | Term |
---|---|---|---|
EURALO |
NomCom Selected |
2018AGM- |
2020AGM |
EURALO |
---|
*Bastiaan Goslings | RALO Elected | 2016AGM-2018 AGM 2018AGM-2020 AGM |
EURALO |
---|
Matthias Hudobnik | RALO |
2019 AGM- |
2021 AGM |
In accordance with Article XI of the ICANN bylaws, Section 2, Paragraph 4c, "the regular terms of members of the ALAC shall be as follows:
1. The term of one member selected by each RALO shall begin at the conclusion of an ICANN annual meeting in an even-numbered year.
2. The term of the other member selected by each RALO shall begin at the conclusion of an ICANN annual meeting in an odd-numbered year.
3. The terms of three of the members selected by the Nominating Committee shall begin at the conclusion of an annual meeting in an odd-numbered year and the terms of the other two members selected by the Nominating Committee shall begin at the conclusion of an annual meeting in an even-numbered year.
4. The regular term of each member shall end at the conclusion of the second ICANN annual meeting after the term began.
For more information, or if you have questions about joining At-Large, send an email to staff@atlarge.icann.org.
*Veronica Cretu stepped down on 5th January 2016 was replaced by Bastiaan Gossling who was elected by election to complete Veronica's term.
ALAC NomCom Representative
Former EURALO ALAC Representatives, Board Members and Officers
...