AT-LARGE GATEWAY
At-Large Regional Policy Engagement Program (ARPEP)
At-Large Review Implementation Plan Development
Page History
CURRENT APRALO OFFICERS
...
2023-2024
Position | Name | ALS/Location | Term(s) |
---|---|---|---|
CHAIR |
Holly Raiche
ISOC - AU
1 July- 30 June 2015
Appointed to the ALAC Leadership Team Dec 2013 - Dec 2014
VICE-CHAIR
Fouad Bajwa
Pakistan ICT Policy Monitor
Cybercafe Association CCAOI | 2022-2024 AGM | ||
VICE-CHAIR | Ali AlMeshal | 2023-2025 AGM |
VICE-CHAIR |
Elected through June 2015
Elected as Acting Vice Chair from Dec 2103 - June 2015
SECRETARIAT
ISOC-HK
ISOC-HK: Edmon Chung and Pavan Budhrani (.ASIA)
Re-selected through to June 2015
From the ICANN 48th meeting, as decided by APRALO's Chair, Siranush Vardanyan wll be APRALO's acting Chair until new elections are held.
Aris Ignacio | 2022-2024 AGM | ||
SECRETARIAT* | ISOC Hong Kong | 2023 AGM - 2024 AGM 2022 AGM - 2023 AGM 2021 AGM - 2022 AGM 2020 AGM - 2021 AGM 2018 AGM- 2020 AGM 2017 AGM- 2018 AGM |
APRALO has three (3) elected Officers to run its affairs one (1) appointment of Secretariat and two (2) elected representatives to the ICANN At-Large Advisory Committee (ALAC).*The APRALO Secretariat position is a discretionary appointment
ALAC REPRESENTATIVES
To help with At-Large organisingorganizing, and to work with user groups worldwide in advising ICANN on pending issues of interest to end users, ICANN created the 15-member Interim At-Large Advisory Committee (ALAC) in 2003. Each RALO has 3 ALAC members.
Current ALAC members from Asia Pacific are
Name | ALS/Location | Term(s) | Comments |
Maureen Hilyard | Cook Islands | AGM 2013- AGM 2015 | Elected |
Rafid Fatani | Saudi Arabia | AGM 2013- AGM 2015 | Appointed by NomCom |
Holly Raiche | Australia | AGM 2012-2014 | Elected |
Current ALAC NomCom Representative
...
Satish Babu
...
India
2013-2014
Previous ALAC NomCom Representative
NAME | LOCATION | TERM |
Siranush Vardanyan | Armenia | 2011-2013 |
:
ALAC Members
RALO | Member | RALO/NomCom Result | Term |
---|---|---|---|
APRALO | Justine Chew | NomCom Selected | 2023 AGM-2025 AGM |
APRALO | Shah Zahidur Rahman | RALO Elected | 2023 AGM- 2025 AGM |
APRALO | Satish Babu | RALO Elected | 2022 AGM-2024 AGM |
ALAC Voting Delegate to the NomCom
ALAC Appointed Delegate to the NomCom | Term |
---|---|
Maureen Hilyard | AGM 2023-2024 AGM |
Rules on ALAC REPRESENTATIVES
In accordance with Article XI of the ICANN bylaws, Section 2, Paragraph 4c, "the regular terms of members of the ALAC shall be as follows:
1. The term of one member selected by each RALO shall begin at the conclusion of an ICANN annual meeting in an even-numbered year.
2. The term of the other member selected by each RALO shall begin at the conclusion of an ICANN annual meeting in an odd-numbered year.
3. The terms of three of the members selected by the Nominating Committee shall begin at the conclusion of an annual meeting in an odd-numbered year and the terms of the other two members selected by the Nominating Committee shall begin at the conclusion of an annual meeting in an even-numbered year.
4. The regular term of each member shall end at the conclusion of the second ICANN annual meeting after the term began.
For more information, or if you have questions about joining At-Large, send an email to <staff@atlargestaff@atlarge.icann.org>org.
Previous APRALO Regional Officers
...
Position
...
Name
...
ALS/Location
...
Term(s)
...
CHAIR
...
Holly Raiche
...
ISOC - AU
...
Term: 1 July 2013 to 30 June 2015
Interim Term: 18 October 2012 through 30 June 2013 (finishing term of Charles Mok)
...
VICE-CHAIR
...
Fouad Bajwa
...
Pakistan ICT Policy Monitor
...
Re-elected Vice Chair from 30 June to serve 2012-2014 term.
...
VICE-CHAIR
...
YJ Park
...
18 October 2012 through 30 June 2013 (finishing Holly Raiche's Term)
...
SECRETARIAT
...
ISOC-HK
...
ISOC-HK: Edmon Chung and Pavan Budhrani (.ASIA)
...